ZMO Homes LLC v. Bakke
Plaintiff: ZMO Homes LLC
Defendant: Ms. Susan Bakke
Counter-Claimant: Ms. Susan Bakke
Counter-Defendant: ZMO Homes LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv12494
Filed: September 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Contract Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2024 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (Zaidel, B)
November 12, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Susan Bakke against ZMO Homes LLC by Susan Bakke. (Wawrzyniak, Lauren)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER Adjourning Deadline for Defendant to File First Responsive Pleading re #4 Amended Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 11/12/2024) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
October 23, 2024 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard Allen Patton appearing on behalf of Susan Bakke (Patton, Richard)
October 23, 2024 Filing 8 [STRICKEN-Signature on Appearance does not match E-filer Attorney. ] ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lauren M. Wawrzyniak appearing on behalf of All Defendants Richard A. Patton counsel for Susan Bakke (Wawrzyniak, Lauren) Modified on 10/23/2024 (SHic).
October 23, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lauren M. Wawrzyniak appearing on behalf of All Defendants Susan Bakke (Wawrzyniak, Lauren)
October 23, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Paul A. Carthew appearing on behalf of Susan Bakke (Carthew, Paul)
October 23, 2024 NOTICE of Error directed to: Lauren M. Wawrzyniak re #8 Attorney Appearance. Other Signature on appearance does not match e-filer attorney.. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SHic)
October 14, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Susan Bakke served on 10/9/2024, answer due 10/30/2024. (Rosenberg, Eric) [NO GREEN CARD RETURNED] Modified on 10/15/2024 (THum).
September 24, 2024 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint filed by ZMO Homes LLC against Susan Bakke. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Rosenberg, Eric)
September 24, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Susan Bakke* (SHic)
September 23, 2024 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by ZMO Homes LLC (Rosenberg, Eric)
September 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Including Body and 4 Exhibits filed by ZMO Homes LLC against Susan Bakke. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9949880 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Rosenberg, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZMO Homes LLC v. Bakke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Susan Bakke
Represented By: Richard Allen Patton
Represented By: Paul A. Carthew
Represented By: Lauren M. Wawrzyniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZMO Homes LLC
Represented By: Eric J. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Ms. Susan Bakke
Represented By: Richard Allen Patton
Represented By: Paul A. Carthew
Represented By: Lauren M. Wawrzyniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: ZMO Homes LLC
Represented By: Eric J. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?