Overton v. Rardin
Petitioner: Marcellus Christopher Overton
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Case Number: 2:2024cv12553
Filed: September 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2024 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jessica Vartanian Currie appearing on behalf of Eric Rardin (Currie, Jessica)
October 21, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Vartanian Currie on behalf of E. Emmerich. (Currie, Jessica)
October 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Sean F. Cox and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (SSch)
October 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Office of the United States Attorney. Response due by 12/19/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (MSyl) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/16/2024) (MSyl).
October 10, 2024 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 5.00 by Marcellus Christopher Overton - Receipt No. 150012481 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (APok)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for Failure to submit IFP application. Correction due by 10/24/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JPar)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Amending Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JPar)
September 27, 2024 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-01661.
September 27, 2024 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Southern District of Indiana. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Transferring Action to the Eastern District of Michigan - This action is transferred to the Eastern District of Michigan, Southern Division. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by District Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/24/2024.(JRB) [Transferred from insd on 9/27/2024.]
September 27, 2024 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDPETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MARCELLUS OVERTON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Continuation Page for complaint, and exhibits including Judgment, Inmate Data, TruLincs messages, Re-Entry Plan, #2 Envelope)(DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-01661.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2024: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (MSyl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overton v. Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcellus Christopher Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Represented By: Jessica Vartanian Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?