Roberts v. Curley
Petitioner: David Roberts
Respondent: Donald Curley
Case Number: 2:2024cv13214
Filed: December 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM of Law re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by David Roberts. (JHea)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Michigan Attorney General and the Michigan Department of Corrections. Response due by 6/6/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (JPar)
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Amending Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JPar)
December 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David Roberts against Curley, Receipt No: 150013190 - Fee: $ 5. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JPar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Curley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald Curley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?