Menefee v. Metropolitan Wayne County International Airport et al
Plaintiff: Rico Menefee
Defendant: John Clark and Metropolitan Wayne County International Airport
Case Number: 2:2024cv13334
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Susan K DeClercq
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Rico Menefee re #4 Notice of Practice Guidelines (JHea)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Opinion and Order Granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Dismissing Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (LVer)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Dismissing Case on Rico Menefee 14100 W. Fairmount Dr. Detroit, MI 48205 (LVer)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of District Judge Susan K. DeClercq Practice Guidelines. (KBro)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Notice of Practice Guidelines on Rico Menefee, 14100 W. Fairmount Dr., Detroit, MI 48205. (KBro)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Rico Menefee. (JHea)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rico Menefee against All Defendants (JHea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menefee v. Metropolitan Wayne County International Airport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rico Menefee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Wayne County International Airport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?