Gamboa v. Rardin
Petitioner: Arnoldo A. Gamboa
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Case Number: 2:2025cv10331
Filed: February 4, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Susan K DeClercq
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (LGra)
February 25, 2025 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Arnoldo A. Gamboa. (JPar)
February 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee. Correction due by 3/4/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (LGra)
February 6, 2025 Filing 2 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (CShr)
February 4, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Arnoldo A. Gamboa against Eric Rardin. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet) (LGra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamboa v. Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arnoldo A. Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?