Roggero et al v. Fay Servicing et al
Plaintiff: Latina Roggero and Upright Property Management LLC
Defendant: Fay Servicing and Codilis & Moody, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2025cv10520
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Brandy R McMillion
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Quiet Title Action by Latina Roggero [Pro Se Document Upload] (JPar)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Exhibit List by Latina Roggero. (JHea)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION AND ORDER OF SUMMARY DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Opinion & Order mailed to Latina Roggero, 4837 Mercer Rd., Pinckney, MI 48169. (LHos)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (THum)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Plaintiff's Notice Waiving Service by U.S. Marshal by Latina Roggero. [Pro Se Document Upload] (JHea)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Latina Roggero. [Pro Se Document Upload] (JHea)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Latina Roggero against Codilis & Moody, P.C., Fay Servicing. [Pro Se Document Upload] (JHea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roggero et al v. Fay Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latina Roggero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Upright Property Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Codilis & Moody, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?