Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 76.238.201.96

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 76.238.201.96
Case Number: 3:2018cv12464
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Robert H Cleland
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Bernier, Joel)
August 13, 2018 NOTICE of Error directed to: Joel A. Bernier. Form AO 121 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
August 9, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #2 MOTION for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Bernier, Joel)[DOCKET ERROR - WRONG EVENT USED - DOCUMENT IS TITLED MEMORANDUM] Modified on 8/9/2018 (NAhm).
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Malibu Media, LLC. (Bernier, Joel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 76.238.201.96 with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-6852540 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Los Angeles - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Bernier, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 76.238.201.96
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 76.238.201.96
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Joel A. Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?