Mohammed v. Seastar, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ali Atia Mohammed
Defendant: SAFMARINE, John Doe 3, Seastar, LLC, JOHN DOE 2 and JOHN DOE 1
Case Number: 3:2018cv13500
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:741
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL - Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference RE-set for 1/17/2019 09:30 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland; 26 f Report due by 1/10/2019 THE COURT WILL INITIATE THE CALL (LWag)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2018 11:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland< IN PORT HURON, MI/b< (LWag)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Crossclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Seastar, LLC. (Dagher, Ali)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Seastar, LLC. (Dagher, Ali)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM filed by SAFMARINE against Seastar, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM filed by SAFMARINE against Ali Atia Mohammed by SAFMARINE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waybill, #2 Exhibit Terms of Carriage) (Galea, Paul)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali H. Dagher on behalf of Seastar, LLC. (Dagher, Ali)
November 13, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Zwicker on behalf of SAFMARINE. (Zwicker, Adam)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SAFMARINE from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 18-008603-CK. Receipt No: 0645-6984511 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Wayne County Circuit Court, 18-008603-CK, Judge Patricia Perez Fresard] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Correspondence, #4 Exhibit State Court Removal) (Galea, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammed v. Seastar, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAFMARINE
Represented By: Paul D. Galea
Represented By: Adam C. Zwicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seastar, LLC
Represented By: Ali H. Dagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Atia Mohammed
Represented By: Mohammed Abdrabboh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?