Hunter v. Withmore et al
Plaintiff: Carl Hunter
Defendant: US Treasury DC, Grechen Withmore and US Treasury
Case Number: 3:2019cv10354
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing complaint and application to proceed without prepaying fees and enjoining plaintiff from filing further complaints without leave of Court. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (DPer)
March 12, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Order Dismissing Case on Carl Hunter at 401 W Bishop, Flint, MI 48505. (LWag)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Carl Hunter. (NAhm)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Carl Hunter to Show Cause why the amended complaint and application to proceed in forma pauperis should not be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 3/8/2019 Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
February 21, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order to Show Cause, on Carl Hunter at 401 W Bishop, Flint, MI 48505. (LWag)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Carl Hunter against US Treasury, Grechen Withmore; with petition to United States Supreme Court. (DPer)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Carl Hunter. (DPer)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Carl Hunter against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Withmore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Treasury DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grechen Withmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?