Arvin v. Social Security

Plaintiff: Robert Graham Arvin, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv11048
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER for Social Security Case: Plaintiff Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/5/2019; Defendant Response and Motion due by 9/4/2019; and Plaintiff Reply due by 9/11/2019 - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (SOso)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT of Social Security Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Mays, Vanessa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Mays, Vanessa)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Santen on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Santen, Sean)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/22/2017, answer due 6/21/2017. (Royal, Daryl)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (LHos)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. **Plaintiff is responsible for proper service of the complaint - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LHos)
April 11, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (DWor)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Robert Graham Arvin, Jr. (Royal, Daryl)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robert Graham Arvin, Jr against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Monroe - County Where Action Arose: Monroe - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Royal, Daryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arvin v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sean Santen
Represented By: Vanessa Miree Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Graham Arvin, Jr.
Represented By: Daryl C. Royal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?