Outlaw Laboratory, LP v. 10 Mile & I94 Petro Mart Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Outlaw Laboratory, LP
Defendant: 10 Mile & I94 Petro Mart Inc., 15035 STREET ENTERPRISES LLC, 24/7 C STORE LLC, 75 & WEST ROAD INC, 7 MILE & COYLE FUELS INC, JSD ENTERPRISE INC, 23 AND BAKER BP INC., 643 TELEGRAPH LLC, 5 MILE & INKSTER PETROMART LLC and 23 & VAN DYKE BP INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv11309
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
2 Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 7 MILE & COYLE FUELS INC served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 5 MILE & INKSTER PETROMART LLC served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *23 & VAN DYKE BP INC.* (SKra)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 23 & VAN DYKE BP INC. by Outlaw Laboratory, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint Return of Service) (Boss, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER by 23 AND BAKER BP INC.. (Makled, Amir)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Set Aside #11 Clerks Entry of Default by Outlaw Laboratory, LP. (Boss, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *JSD ENTERPRISE INC* (SKra)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *15035 STREET ENTERPRISES LLC* (SKra)
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *10 Mile & I94 Petro Mart Inc.* (SKra)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 10 Mile & I94 Petro Mart Inc., 15035 STREET ENTERPRISES LLC, JSD ENTERPRISE INC by Outlaw Laboratory, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint Return of Service, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint Return of Service, #3 Exhibit Summons and Complaint Return of Service) (Boss, Christopher)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 75 & WEST ROAD INC served on 6/9/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 643 TELEGRAPH LLC served on 6/9/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 24/7 C STORE LLC served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *23 AND BAKER BP INC.* (SKra)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. JSD ENTERPRISE INC served on 5/19/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 15035 STREET ENTERPRISES LLC served on 5/19/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 23 AND BAKER BP INC. by Outlaw Laboratory, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint Return of Service) (Boss, Christopher)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 10 Mile & I94 Petro Mart Inc. served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 23 AND BAKER BP INC. served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 23 & VAN DYKE BP INC. served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III in Detroit to District Judge Robert H. Cleland in Port Huron. (NAhm)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Outlaw Laboratory, LP re Notice of Error, (Boss, Christopher)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Christopher W. Boss. Form AO 120 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Outlaw Laboratory, LP against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7227506 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Boss, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outlaw Laboratory, LP v. 10 Mile & I94 Petro Mart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10 Mile & I94 Petro Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 15035 STREET ENTERPRISES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24/7 C STORE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 75 & WEST ROAD INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7 MILE & COYLE FUELS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSD ENTERPRISE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 23 AND BAKER BP INC.
Represented By: Amir I Makled
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 643 TELEGRAPH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 MILE & INKSTER PETROMART LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 23 & VAN DYKE BP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outlaw Laboratory, LP
Represented By: Christopher W. Boss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?