Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Shelide et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Renee Bailey, Marie T. Yaden, Macomb Oakland Guardianship, Inc. as Guardian for Joseph F. Shelide and Fred J. Shelide
Case Number: 3:2019cv12009
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Macomb Oakland Guardianship, Inc. as Guardian for Joseph F. Shelide served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Davis, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fred J. Shelide served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Davis, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Renee Bailey served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Davis, David)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses by Marie T. Yaden. (DPer)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (NAhm)
July 10, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Marie T. Yaden* (DWor)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Fred J. Shelide* (DWor)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Macomb Oakland Guardianship, Inc. as Guardian for Joseph F. Shelide* (DWor)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Renee Bailey* (DWor)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Davis, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7312394 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Page 53 of the Certificate of Insurance, #3 Exhibit B-Page 80 of the Summary Plan Description, #4 Exhibit C-Beneficiary Designation Spreadsheet, #5 Exhibit D-10/25/88 Beneficiary Designation, #6 Exhibit E-Decedent's Death Certificate, #7 Exhibit F-Marie Yaden's Life Insurance Claim form, #8 Exhibit G-June-August Submissions from Fred J. Shelide, #9 Exhibit H-8/20/18 Letter from MetLife to Fred Shelide, #10 Exhibit I-8/30/18 Letter from Marshal Garmo, Esq., #11 Exhibit J-10/24/18 Appeal from Fred J. Shelide, #12 Exhibit K-Small Claims Court Papers filed by Fred J. Shelide, #13 Exhibit L-Guardianship Papers Regarding Joseph F. Shelide, #14 Exhibit M-Marie Yaden's Letter to MetLife Dated 4/17/19, #15 Exhibit N-3/28/19 Pre-Interpleader Letter From MetLife) (Davis, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Shelide et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie T. Yaden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macomb Oakland Guardianship, Inc. as Guardian for Joseph F. Shelide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred J. Shelide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?