WYLIE v. DEUTSCHE BANK
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Quentin Wylie
Defendant: 19727 APPOLINE ST. DETRIOT, MI. 48235 and Deutsche Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv12209
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Emmanuel Quentin Wylie re Certificate of Service, #8 Order, (NAhm)
August 13, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Order, on Emmanuel Quentin Wylie at 4364 Glendale St, Detroit, MI 48238. (LWag)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Procced in forma pauperis, DENYING AS MOOT #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank and SUMMARILY DISMISSING the complaint. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Sabbota Gottlieb on behalf of Deutsche Bank. (Gottlieb, Amy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Deutsche Bank. (Martin, Eric)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Martin on behalf of Deutsche Bank. (Martin, Eric)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (NAhm)
July 26, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the District of Columbia. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-01628. Modified on 7/26/2019 (VLun).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Eastern District of Michigan. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 7/23/2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/02/2019. (zmc) [Transferred from dcd on 7/26/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT against 19727 APPOLINE ST. DETRIOT, MI. 48235, DEUTSCHE BANK filed by EMMANUEL QUENTIN WYLIE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-01628.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WYLIE v. DEUTSCHE BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 19727 APPOLINE ST. DETRIOT, MI. 48235
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Quentin Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?