Taylor v. Eastpointe, City of et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Conie Taylor and Conie Taylor
Defendant: Prosecuting Attorney Eric J. Smith, Macomb County, Eastpointe, City of, Macomb, County of and Eric J. Smith
Case Number: 3:2019cv13276
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Robert H Cleland
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Eastpointe, City of. (Ferrand, Timothy)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Ferrand on behalf of Eastpointe, City of. (Ferrand, Timothy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING on #6 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Eric J. Smith. (Schapka, John)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Macomb, County of. (Schapka, John)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Eric J. Smith* (DPer)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Macomb, County of* (DPer)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Eastpointe, City of* (DPer)
November 7, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 2:19-13276 filed by Conie Taylor against All Plaintiffs. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7476743 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: Macomb County Circuit, 17-002054-CZ, Judge Joseph Toia] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Moore, Jerome)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Eastpointe, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosecuting Attorney Eric J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macomb County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastpointe, City of
Represented By: Timothy S. Ferrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macomb, County of
Represented By: John A. Schapka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric J. Smith
Represented By: John A. Schapka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Conie Taylor
Represented By: Jerome A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conie Taylor
Represented By: Jerome A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?