Groulx v. MacDonald
Plaintiff: Law Offices of Dean J. Groulx and Esq Dean J. Groulx
Defendant: Confederation Technologies, Inc., David MacDonald and Confederation Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv10464
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Robert H Cleland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Nine, Paul)[DOCUMENT IS AN AMENDED COMPLAINT ONLY] Modified on 3/19/2020 (DPer).
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Vacating #6 Order to Show Cause, Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause by All Plaintiffs. (Nine, Paul)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Vanneste on behalf of All Defendants. (Vanneste, Mark)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Dean J. Groulx, Law Offices of Dean J. Groulx to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 3/13/2020 Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT of Disclosure Statement FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 by Dean J. Groulx (Nine, Paul)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Dean J. Groulx (Nine, Paul)
February 24, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Confederation Holdings, Inc., Confederation Technologies, Inc., David MacDonald* (SKra)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Confederation Holdings, Inc., Confederation Technologies, Inc., David MacDonald* (SKra)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Dean J. Groulx, Confederation Technologies, Inc., Confederation Holdings, Inc., Law Offices of Dean J. Groulx. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7623213 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Prince Edward Island. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Nine, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groulx v. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Confederation Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Mark C. Vanneste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David MacDonald
Represented By: Mark C. Vanneste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Confederation Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Mark C. Vanneste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Offices of Dean J. Groulx
Represented By: Paul L. Nine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esq Dean J. Groulx
Represented By: Paul L. Nine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?