Grifo & Company PLLC v. Cloud X Partners Holdings, LLC f/k/a InsynQ, LLC
Plaintiff: Grifo & Company PLLC
Defendant: Cloud X Partners Holdings, LLC f/k/a InsynQ, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv10858
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER DENYING #7 MOTION to Strike #6 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Grifo & Company PLLC. To correct Defendants breach of protocol in raising new issues in a reply brief, Plaintiff may file a sur-reply by June 4, 2020. Plaintiff is granted extended pages in its sur-reply to a limit of twenty pages. The court invites NO ADDITIONAL BRIEFING from Defendant at this time.. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike #6 Reply to Response to Motion by Grifo & Company PLLC. (Watson, Linda)
May 19, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 5/27/2020 is Cancelled re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (LWag)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY to Response re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition filed by Cloud X Partners Holdings, LLC f/k/a InsynQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Visibility Holdings) (Christie, John)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Grifo & Company PLLC. (Watson, Linda)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING on #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Cloud X Partners Holdings, LLC f/k/a InsynQ, LLC. (Christie, John)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda M. Watson on behalf of Grifo & Company PLLC. (Watson, Linda)
April 3, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cloud X Partners Holdings, LLC f/k/a InsynQ, LLC from Oakland County, case number 2020-179943-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7718631 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Service of Process Transmittal Form, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Proof of Service of Summons, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Proof of Service of Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Notice of Notice of Removal) (Christie, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grifo & Company PLLC v. Cloud X Partners Holdings, LLC f/k/a InsynQ, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grifo & Company PLLC
Represented By: Linda M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloud X Partners Holdings, LLC f/k/a InsynQ, LLC
Represented By: John R. Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?