Imm v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lana Lorraine Imm
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv11943
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Lana Lorraine Imm served on 8/5/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Versical, Bethany)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Tarabelli on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Tarabelli, Daniel)
July 20, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (DWor)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (DWor)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lana Lorraine Imm against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7934584 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Lenawee - County Where Action Arose: Lucas - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Versical, Bethany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imm v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel S. Tarabelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Lorraine Imm
Represented By: Bethany G. Versical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?