Drummond v. Paulson et al
Plaintiff: Robert Drummond
Defendant: Lofts at Rivertown Condominium Association, Allen Paulson and Alan Paulson
Case Number: 3:2020cv12227
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Robert H Cleland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen J. Philbrick on behalf of Alan Paulson. (Philbrick, Allen)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Alan Paulson served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Boyle, Eugene)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lofts at Rivertown Condominium Association served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Champane, Michelle)
August 21, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Lofts at Rivertown Condominium Association* (TTho)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Alan Paulson* (TTho)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Robert Drummond against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G) (Champane, Michelle)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard W. Burdett, Jr on behalf of Robert Drummond. (Burdett, Howard)
August 18, 2020 FILING FEE Received in the amount of $400 by Robert Drummond - Receipt No. 7995908 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drummond v. Paulson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lofts at Rivertown Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Paulson
Represented By: Allen J. Philbrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Drummond
Represented By: Michelle Dean Champane
Represented By: Howard W. Burdett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?