Eason v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Donald Eason
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer, Jocelyn Benson and Jonathan Brater
Case Number: 3:2020cv12252
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Donald Eason (Eason, Darryl)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER denying #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 9, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 9/10/2020 is Cancelled re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction (LWag)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland |Zoom Webinar Information: Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/97283993765?pwd=bHIzRXVxeFhlVjA4L0wvM2NNdndyZz09 Passcode: 818392 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13126266799,,97283993765#,,,,,,0#,,818392# or +13017158592,,97283993765#,,,,,,0#,,818392#| (LWag)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Jonathan Brater, Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A. Detroit Unity Fund, UDSC-ED opinion, #3 Exhibit B. Detroit Unity Fund, 6th COA opinion) (Meingast, Heather)
August 29, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erik A. Grill appearing on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer (Grill, Erik)
August 29, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Heather S. Meingast appearing on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer (Meingast, Heather)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION AND ORDER Denying in Part #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Setting a Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Response due by 9/2/2020; Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (MacKay, K)
August 20, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Gretchen Whitmer* (DWor)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Jonathan Brater* (DWor)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Jocelyn Benson* (DWor)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Donald Eason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit List of COVID-19 Orders, #3 Exhibit Ballot Information from State of Michigan, #4 Exhibit Accommodations from State of Michigan) (Eason, Darryl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Donald Eason against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7997426 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Jackson - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court- Eastern District of Michigan, 2:20-cv-10831, Judge Terrence G. Berg] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration) (Eason, Darryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eason v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Eason
Represented By: Darryl W. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Brater
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?