DS Sales, Inc., d/b/a Premier International, Inc. v. Essentium, Inc.
Plaintiff: DS Sales, Inc., d/b/a Premier International, Inc.
Defendant: Essentium, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv12472
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Patti : Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
November 4, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Robert H. Cleland: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/4/2020. At the request of counsel case to be referred to MJ Patti for mediation. ALL Filings and Deadlines SUSPENDED. (LWag)
October 29, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Robert H. Cleland: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/29/2020, ( TELEPHONIC Status Conference reset for 11/4/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) (LWag)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Wernette, Michael)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by DS Sales, Inc., d/b/a Premier International, Inc. (Wernette, Michael)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DS Sales, Inc., d/b/a Premier International, Inc. (Wernette, Michael)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by DS Sales, Inc., d/b/a Premier International, Inc.. (Wernette, Michael)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cynthia M. Filipovich appearing on behalf of Essentium, Inc. and Certificate of Service (Filipovich, Cynthia)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM and Certificate of Service filed by Essentium, Inc. against DS Sales, Inc., d/b/a Premier International, Inc. by Essentium, Inc.. (Hood, Edward)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending time for Defendant to file a Response, ( Response due by 9/30/2020) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Essentium, Inc. (Hood, Edward)
September 9, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Essentium, Inc. from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2020-182865-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8035952 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Hood, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DS Sales, Inc., d/b/a Premier International, Inc. v. Essentium, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DS Sales, Inc., d/b/a Premier International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Wernette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essentium, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Hood
Represented By: Cynthia M. Filipovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?