Collins v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: Oliver Collins
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company and Canadian National Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv12566
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke L Hamilton on behalf of Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (Hamilton, Brooke)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Alexandersen on behalf of Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Canadian National Railway Company for Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (Mountcastle, Colleen)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (Mountcastle, Colleen)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oliver Collins (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Abro, Brandon)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Canadian National Railway Company* (DPer)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company* (DPer)
September 21, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Oliver Collins against Canadian National Railway Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8056017 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Lapeer - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Ontario. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Abro, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Represented By: Brooke L Hamilton
Represented By: Colleen A. Mountcastle
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian National Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Collins
Represented By: Brandon Johnny Abro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?