Alliance Laundry Systems LLC v. Shiffone Enterprises LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alliance Laundry Systems LLC
Defendant: Shiffone Enterprises LLC and Shiffone L. Moore
Case Number: 3:2021cv11702
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Shiffone L. Moore* (DPer)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Shiffone Enterprises LLC* (DPer)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Defendants by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC. (Mayette, Anne)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default JUDGMENT as to * All Defendants *. Reason: *An initial request for clerk's entry of default as to the defendants was not filed.* (DPer)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Judgment by Default with Affidavit of Sum Certain as to All Defendants in the amount of $98608.33 by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC. (Mayette, Anne)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint,,, #5 Summons Issued by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC (Mayette, Anne)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,, by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC (Mayette, Anne)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Shiffone L. Moore* (DPer)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Shiffone Enterprises LLC* (DPer)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alliance Laundry Holdings LLC for Alliance Laundry Systems LLC. (Mayette, Anne)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M. Mayette on behalf of Alliance Laundry Systems LLC. (Mayette, Anne)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8547772 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Fond du Lac - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Promissory Note dated March 27, 2019, #3 Exhibit 2 - Personal Guaranty dated March 29, 2019, #4 Exhibit 3 - Security Agreement dated March 29, 2019, #5 Exhibit 4 - UCC-1 Financing Statement, #6 Exhibit 5 - Agreement to Assign Lease and Landlords Consent dated April 1, 2019, #7 Exhibit 6 - Consent to Repossession dated October 26, 2019, #8 Exhibit 7 - Demand Letter dated April 21, 2021) (Mayette, Anne)
July 22, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance Laundry Systems LLC v. Shiffone Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance Laundry Systems LLC
Represented By: Anne M. Mayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiffone Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiffone L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?