Securities and Exchange Commission v McKnight

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Gregory N McKnight, Legisi Holdings, LLC, Legisi Marketing, Incorporated, LIDO Consulting, LLC, Healthy Body Nutraceuticals, Lindenwood Enterprises, LLC, Danielle Burton, Theresa Burton and Jennifer McKnight
Receiver: Robert D Gordon
Case Number: 4:2008cv11887
Filed: May 5, 2008
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Flint Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Gadola
Referring Judge: Morgan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2017 726 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 720 the Receiver's Motion for authority to (I) make third interim Distribution to creditors and (II) employ Epiq Systems, Inc. to serve as disbursing agent. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
April 19, 2016 678 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 666 Receiver's Motion for authority to make interim distribution to creditors and employ Epiq Systems, Inc. to serve as disbursing agent. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
September 15, 2015 648 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving 647 Ex Parte Motion of the Receiver to auction real properties and discharge notices of lis pendens recorded against the properties (see order for descriptions) Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
December 17, 2012 517 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 506 Motion for authority to (A) reserve distributions to be made to claimants without valid current addresses in the receiver's database and (B) require such claimants to update their addresses with the receiver within 90 days, and (II) for related relief. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
June 7, 2012 473 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Receiver's Motion for Authority to (I) make interim distribution to creditors and (II) employ Xroads Case Management Services, LLC to serve as disbursing agent 465 and Overruling Legisi Creditors' objection to receiver's motion for interim distribution and request to compel a far larger distribution to Legisi victims 467 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
May 31, 2012 470 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Amending 399 Order on Motion to Take Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Randon. (Miles, M)
July 14, 2011 415 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the receiver's first omnibus Objection to claims (duplicate claims) filed by Robert D Gordon 392 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
June 14, 2010 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting seventh fee Application 328 filed by Clark Hill PLC. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
March 15, 2010 288 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT as to relief defendant Jennifer McKnight ONLY (granting) 287 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
July 6, 2009 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 195 First Amended Third Fee Application of Clark Hill PLC for allowance and payment of fees and reimbursement of expenses incurred as counsel Robert D. Gordon, receiver, for the period 11/1/08 through 1/31/09. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
April 22, 2009 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petitioner's MOTION for an Order authorizing and directing the receiver to pay Spender & Robb P.C. and the Roth Law Firm, PLLC 121 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: James G. O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory N McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legisi Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legisi Marketing, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIDO Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthy Body Nutraceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindenwood Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Robert D Gordon
Represented By: Robert D. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?