Hertz Schram PC et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff: Hertz Schram PC, Psychopathic Records, Inc. and Insane Clown Posse, LLC
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 4:2012cv14234
Filed: September 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Goldsmith
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 OPINION and ORDER (1) Overruling Plaintiff's Objections 54 , (2) Accepting the Recommendation Contained in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 53 , and (3) Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees 47 . Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (CHad)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendant Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Second Motion For Summary Judgment 38 . Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JCur)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Leave for Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation to File a Second Summary Judgment Motion and Adjourning Scheduling Dates Pending Further Order of the Court, (Response due by 4/23/2014). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Goltz, D)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation's 26 Motion for Summary Judgment, (Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief due by 3/5/2014, Defendant's Supplemental Brief due by 3/12/2014). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Goltz, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hertz Schram PC et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hertz Schram PC
Represented By: Howard Hertz
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Psychopathic Records, Inc.
Represented By: Howard Hertz
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Insane Clown Posse, LLC
Represented By: Howard Hertz
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Laura A. Sagolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?