Guldenstein et al v. Merit Energy Company LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Guldenstein and Karen Guldenstein
Defendant: Merit Energy Company LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv14181
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Flint Office
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Linda V. Parker
Presiding Judge: Anthony P. Patti
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendant's 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Strike--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Adopting Magistrate Judge's 63 Report and Recommendation Concerning Plaintiff's March 13, 2017 Response and Imposing Sanctions Against Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(c). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 39 Motion Reimburstment of Cost--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guldenstein et al v. Merit Energy Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merit Energy Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Guldenstein
Represented By: Daniel V. Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Guldenstein
Represented By: Daniel V. Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?