Rogers v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: D. Rodney Rogers
Defendant: Ryan, Sabbi, Serina Kelley, Jeffrey Morin, Micheal Conley, Warren C. Evan, City of Detroit Mayor, John Doe 1 and John Doe 2
Case Number: 4:2016cv12735
Filed: July 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Flint Office
County: Montcalm
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Presiding Judge: Linda V. Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 OPINION and ORDER Denying Defendants' 210 211 Motions in Limine. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 OPINION and ORDER Adopting Magistrate Judge's 176 Report and Recommendation and Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' 115 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 OPINION and ORDER Addressing Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation and Plaintiff's Objections Thereto. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 OPINION and ORDER Addressing (1) Magistrate Judge's 152 Report and Recommendation Dated December 14, 2018 and 131 134 Orders Dated November 1 and 15, 2018, and (2) Granting Plaintiff's 146 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 OPINION and ORDER Rejecting Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge Grand's August 23, 2018 113 Order and Affirming that Order. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 OPINION and ORDER Denying as Moot the 102 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 OPINION and ORDER (1) Setting Aside Court's 83 Dismissal Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) and Reopening Case; (2) Adopting Magistrate Judge's 78 Report and Recommendation; (3) Denying Plaintiff's 73 Motion for Temporar y Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction; and (4) Extending Deadlines (Discovery due by 7/2/2018, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 8/31/2018). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION and ORDER Show Cause Response due by 11/21/2017. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPINION and ORDER (1) Adopting Magistrate Judge's 49 Report and Recommendation; and (2) Rejecting Plaintiff's 53 Objections to Report and Recommendation and March 27, 2017 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 OPINION and ORDER Rejecting Plaintiff's 59 Objections to Magistrate Judge's 57 Report and Recommendation, and Dismissing Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint Against Defendants Sabbi and Conley Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. Rodney Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabbi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serina Kelley
Represented By: Jacob M. Satin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren C. Evan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Detroit Mayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?