Bret R. Kelly et al v. The University of Michigan et al

Plaintiff: Corey Foster, Michigan Nurses Association, April Smith and Bret R. Kelly
Defendant: Denise Ilitch, Andrea Fischer Newman, Jesus Cepero, Shauna Ryder Diggs, Andrew C. Richner, Michael J. Behm, Ron Weiser, Michelle Sullivan, The University of Michigan, Katherine E. White and Mark J. Bernstein
Case Number: 4:2018cv12823
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Matthew F Leitman
1 Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2018 15 Featured Case STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 3, 2018 14 Featured Case STIPULATED ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 1, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 10/5/2018 is Cancelled re #12 Order. (HMon)
September 28, 2018 13 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J) (Wheaton, Jill)
September 17, 2018 12 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER for Plaintiffs' #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Response due by 9/28/2018, Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2018 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 14, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/14/2018. (HMon)
September 13, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Boonin on behalf of All Defendants. (Boonin, Robert)
September 13, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. Wheaton on behalf of All Defendants. (Wheaton, Jill)
September 12, 2018 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #5 Exhibit by All Plaintiffs (Nickelhoff, Andrew)
September 12, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Nickelhoff, Andrew)
September 12, 2018 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 9/14/2018 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE AND VIA E-MAIL** (HMon)
September 12, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (EKar)
September 12, 2018 6 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (EKar)
September 12, 2018 5 EXHIBIT re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Corey Foster w/Exh A, #2 Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Johanna R. Crawford w/Exh A) (Nickelhoff, Andrew)
September 11, 2018 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2013-18 CBA (excerpt), #3 Exhibit 2 - UMHHC 04-06-008, Dress and Apparel policy, #4 Exhibit 3 - Photo image of UMPNC shirt, #5 Exhibit 4 - Photo image of "United We Stand" shirt, #6 Exhibit 5 - Photo image of Block-M shirt design, #7 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Bret R. Kelly w/Exhs A-G, #8 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Benjamin Curl, #9 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Anne L. Jackson w/Exhs A-D, #10 Exhibit 9 - Photo image of Block-N shirt design, #11 Exhibit 10 - To be filed at a later date, #12 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of April Smith, #13 Exhibit 12 - Michelle Sullivan's 6/26/18 Memorandum, #14 Exhibit 13 - Photo image of revised Block-N shirt, #15 Exhibit 14 - Pager Message Prohibiting "Where's the Graham Cracker? apparel & gear, #16 Exhibit 15 - May LaDeske 9/5/18 email, #17 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Sarah DeFlon w/Exhs A-B, #18 Exhibit 17 - To be filed at a later date) (Nickelhoff, Andrew)
September 11, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall J. Widick on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Widick, Marshall)
September 11, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mami Kato on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kato, Mami)
September 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6898568 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - UMHHC Policy 04-06-008, #3 Exhibit 2 - Photo images of UMPNC shirt, #4 Exhibit 3 - Photo image of United We Stand shirt, #5 Exhibit 4 - Photo image of Block-M shirt, #6 Exhibit 5 - Photo image of Block-N shirt, #7 Exhibit 6 - Michelle Sullivan's 6/26/28 Memo, #8 Exhibit 7 - Photo image of United We Bargain button, #9 Exhibit 8 - Photo image of revised Block-N shirt) (Nickelhoff, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bret R. Kelly et al v. The University of Michigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Foster
Represented By: Andrew A. Nickelhoff
Represented By: Marshall J. Widick
Represented By: Mami Kato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Nurses Association
Represented By: Andrew A. Nickelhoff
Represented By: Marshall J. Widick
Represented By: Mami Kato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Smith
Represented By: Andrew A. Nickelhoff
Represented By: Marshall J. Widick
Represented By: Mami Kato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret R. Kelly
Represented By: Andrew A. Nickelhoff
Represented By: Marshall J. Widick
Represented By: Mami Kato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Ilitch
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Robert A. Boonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Fischer Newman
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Robert A. Boonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Cepero
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Robert A. Boonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shauna Ryder Diggs
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Robert A. Boonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew C. Richner
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Robert A. Boonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Behm
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Robert A. Boonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Weiser
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Robert A. Boonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Sullivan
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Robert A. Boonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Michigan
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Robert A. Boonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine E. White
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Robert A. Boonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Bernstein
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Robert A. Boonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?