Peterson v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Bradley T. Peterson
Defendant: Matt Brewer, Bryan J. Cozzaglio, Ryan Smith, Woodhaven, City of and State of Michigan
Case Number: 4:2018cv12838
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
1 Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2018 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand by Matt Brewer, Bryan J. Cozzaglio, Ryan Smith, Woodhaven, City of. (Gillooly, John)
October 1, 2018 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Woodhaven, City of served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (SOso)
October 1, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ryan Smith served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (SOso)
October 1, 2018 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bryan J. Cozzaglio served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (SOso)
October 1, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Matt Brewer served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (SOso)
October 1, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Attorney General Office served on 9/17/2018. (SOso)
September 27, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Gillooly on behalf of Matt Brewer, Bryan J. Cozzaglio, Ryan Smith, Woodhaven, City of. (Gillooly, John)
September 18, 2018 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
September 17, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Bradley T. Peterson at 55 Walnut Street, Belleville, MI 48111. (HMon)
September 17, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 12, 2018 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Matt Brewer, Bryan J. Cozzaglio, Ryan Smith, State of Michigan, Woodhaven, City of* (DAll)
September 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bradley T. Peterson against Matt Brewer, Bryan J. Cozzaglio, Ryan Smith, State of Michigan, Woodhaven, City of Receipt No: Det116749 - Fee: $ 400. (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Brewer
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan J. Cozzaglio
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Smith
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodhaven, City of
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley T. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?