Glen v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Nelson Glen and Glen Nelson
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv13393
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (O'Donnell, Mary)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Kantor, Steven)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company* (LGra)
November 13, 2018 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (Kantor, Steven)
November 8, 2018 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Glen Nelson. (Kantor, Steven) Modified on 11/13/2018 (DWor). [REQUESTED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PLAINTIFF]
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption filed by Nelson Glen. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption by Nelson Glen. (Kantor, Steven)
October 31, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (EKar)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company* (EKar)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nelson Glen against Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6970339 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Kantor, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glen v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Represented By: Mary C. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Glen
Represented By: Steven L. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Nelson
Represented By: Steven L. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?