Moore v. Corizon Health, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Charles Moore
Defendant: Corizon Health, Incorporated and Dawn Maly
Interested Party: Michigan Department of Corrections
Case Number: 4:2018cv13845
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Exclude Case from the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
February 8, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order on Motion to Exclude Case from the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program on Charles Moore Pris. No. 223268 at Gus Harrison Correctional Facility, 2727 E. Beecher Street, Adrian, MI 49221. (KCas)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Exclude Case from the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program , with Certificate of Service by Michigan Department of Corrections. (Soros, Allan)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Exclude Case from the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
January 16, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Order on Motion to Exclude Case from the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program on Charles Moore Pris. No. 223268 at Gus Harrison Correctional Facility, 2727 E. Beecher Street, Adrian, MI 49221. (KCas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Exclude Case from the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program by Corizon Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- MDOC Policy Directive 03.04.100) (Van Thomme, Carly)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Carly A. Van Thomme on behalf of Corizon Health, Incorporated for the purposes of the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. (Van Thomme, Carly)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 7, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order Staying Case on Charles Moore Pris. No. 223268 at Gus Harrison Correctional Facility, 2727 E. Beecher Street, Adrian, MI 49221. (HMon)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $5.00 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DAll)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (DAll)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Charles Moore. (DAll)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Charles Moore against Corizon Health, Incorporated, Dawn Maly (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Corizon Health, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Incorporated
Represented By: Carly A. Van Thomme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Maly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michigan Department of Corrections
Represented By: Allan J. Soros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?