Davis v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Susan Davis
Defendant: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corp., Fidelity Workplace Services LLC, Delphi Corporation and General Motors LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv10153
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Simmons, Shawndrica)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Delphi Corporation, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC, General Motors LLC, Pension Benefit Guaranty Corp.* (SSch)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Delphi Corporation, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC, General Motors LLC, Pension Benefit Guaranty Corp.* (HMon) Modified on 2/26/2019 (SSch). [Summons re-issued individually see docket entry #5 ]
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 24, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Simmons, Shawndrica)
January 17, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by All Plaintiffs. (Simmons, Shawndrica)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Fee waiver included in accordance with 28 USC 1916. Plaintiff requests summons issued. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Fee Waiver Form) (Simmons, Shawndrica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Workplace Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delphi Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Davis
Represented By: Shawndrica N. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?