Ally Risk Services Inc. v. Harco National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ally Risk Services Inc.
Defendant: Harco National Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv11919
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on July 17, 2019. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 9) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 8/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2019. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Extending #11 Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 17, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: In Person Status Conference on 7/18/2019 is Cancelled re #12 Notice to Appear. (HMon)
July 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/17/2019. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 12:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR: IN PERSON Status Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's #3 and #5 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2019 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Expedited Consideration of a Preliminary Injunction filed by Ally Risk Services Inc. Disposition: Motion Granted in Part. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HMon)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Expedited Consideration of a Preliminary Injunction re Memorandum of Law in Opposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Harco National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rowe, Todd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M. Rowe on behalf of Harco National Insurance Company. (Rowe, Todd)
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Expedited Consideration of a Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2019 at 1:00 PM (**IN DETROIT - COURTROOM 218**) before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING on #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Expedited Consideration of a Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2019 at 1:00 PM (**IN DETROIT - COURTROOM TBD**) before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/28/2019. Hearing on motion for Temporary Restraining Order to be held Tuesday, July 2, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. Defendant to file response to Plaintiff's motion by Monday, July 1, 2019. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (HMon)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas M. Schehr appearing on behalf of Ally Risk Services Inc. (Schehr, Thomas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA Sheet re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Expedited Consideration of a Preliminary Injunction filed by Ally Risk Services Inc.. by Ally Risk Services Inc. (Kontul, Justin)
June 27, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Harco National Insurance Company* (SKra)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Expedited Consideration of a Preliminary Injunction by Ally Risk Services Inc.. (Kontul, Justin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ally Risk Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ally Financial Inc. for Ally Risk Services Inc.. (Kontul, Justin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ally Risk Services Inc. against Harco National Insurance Company. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7302075 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne County - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Redated Agency - Company Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - June 10, 2019 Email, #4 Exhibit C - June 7, 2019 Email, #5 Exhibit D - June 10, 2019 Email) (Kontul, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ally Risk Services Inc. v. Harco National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ally Risk Services Inc.
Represented By: Justin J. Kontul
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harco National Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd M. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?