Sonima-US Corp. v. Penda Corporation
Plaintiff: Sonima-US Corp.
Defendant: Penda Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv12788
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Sonima-US Corp. against Penda Corporation. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Hart, Erika)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Aside the Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant re #12 Motion to Set Aside #12 Ex Parte MOTION to Set Aside #8 Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION to Set Aside #8 Clerks Entry of Default by Sonima-US Corp.. (Hart, Erika)
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Sonima-US Corp. of withdrawal of #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Penda Corporation . (Hart, Erika)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Penda Corporation by Sonima-US Corp. (Hart, Erika)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Penda Corporation by Sonima-US Corp.. (Hart, Erika)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Penda Corporation* (DPer)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Penda Corporation by Sonima-US Corp.. (Hart, Erika)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Hart, Erika)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Penda Corporation served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Hart, Erika)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sonima-US Corp. (Hart, Erika)
September 24, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Penda Corporation* (DWor)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sonima-US Corp. (Hart, Erika)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sonima-US Corp. against Penda Corporation with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7417651 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Portage, Wisconsin. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hart, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonima-US Corp. v. Penda Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penda Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonima-US Corp.
Represented By: Erika D. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?