Hamilton v. Educational Credit Management Corporation
Plaintiff: Margie Hamilton
Defendant: Educational Credit Management Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv10006
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Margie Hamilton against Educational Credit Management Corporation. (DPer)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to dismiss filed by Margie Hamilton. (DPer)
February 4, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading, on Margie Hamilton at 1205 Kings Carriage, Grand Blanc, MI 48439 (MarW)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Requiring Response to #8 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response due by 2/18/2020; Defendant's Reply, if any due by 3/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW)
January 29, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Margie Hamilton at 1205 Kings Carriage, Grand Blanc, MI 48439. (HMon)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford re #6 Motion to Dismiss, #8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Klisch Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Borrower Snapshot, #4 Exhibit C - Promissory Note and Certification, #5 Exhibit D - Assignment Letter, #6 Exhibit E - Notice of Wage Withholding Letter, #7 Exhibit F - Employer Acknowledgement of Wage Withholding, #8 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Request for Hearing with a Wage Withholding Administrator, #9 Exhibit H - ECMC Response, #10 Exhibit I - ED's AWG Hearing Decision, #11 Exhibit J - Treasury Letter, #12 Exhibit K - Email re: loans) (Stan, Alexandra)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel N. Sharkey on behalf of Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Sharkey, Daniel)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and for Summary Judgment Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Klisch Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Borrower Snapshot, #4 Exhibit C - Promissory Note and Certification, #5 Exhibit D - Assignment Letter, #6 Exhibit E - Notice of Wage Withholding Letter, #7 Exhibit F - Employer Acknowledgement of Wage Withholding, #8 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Request for Hearing with a Wage Withholding Administrator, #9 Exhibit H - ECMC Response, #10 Exhibit I - ED's AWG Hearing Decision, #11 Exhibit J - Treasury Letter, #12 Exhibit K - Email re: loans) (Stan, Alexandra)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Educational Credit Management Corporation (Stan, Alexandra)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Educational Credit Management Corporation* (DPer)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Margie Hamilton against Educational Credit Management Corporation (DPer); Fee Paid: Receipt No. 127963. Modified on 1/8/2020 (DPer).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Educational Credit Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Credit Management Corporation
Represented By: Daniel N. Sharkey
Represented By: Alexandra Stan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?