Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. v. Doe
Plaintiff: Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp.
Defendant: John/Jane 1-10 Doe
Case Number: 4:2020cv12002
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Order on Motion for TRO by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. (Ryan, Christopher)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (1) Granting Preliminary Injunction, (2) Prohibiting Disposition of Assets, and (3) Ordering Immediate Discovery. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Video Motion Hearing held on 8/10/2020 re #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and for Immediate Discovery filed by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Disposition: Motion Granted. Order to Follow. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Bestway Global Holding Inc. for Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp.. (Ryan, Christopher)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Supplemental Brief, by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. (Ryan, Christopher)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and for Immediate Discovery filed by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to PayPal and Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit Subpoena to GoDaddy and Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Subpoena to Cloudflare and Proof of Service) (Ryan, Christopher)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Notice of Hearing on Motion,, #6 Order by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. (Ryan, Christopher)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and for Immediate Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2020 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://zoom.us/j/99336106530?pwd=N2gvUW1IU29CTGsybzhrSC9YVldNdz09 Passcode: 347071 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +12133388477,,99336106530#,,,,,,0#,,347071# or +12532158782,,99336106530#,,,,,,0#,,347071#| (HMon)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (1) Granting Temporary Restraining Order, (2) Scheduling Preliminary Injunction Hearing, (3) Prohibiting Disposition of Assets, (4) Ordering Immediate Discovery. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Robert H. Cleland in Port Huron to District Judge Matthew F. Leitman in Flint. (SSch)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Artz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Artz, John)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 Intellectual Property REPORT AO 120 by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. (Ryan, Christopher)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and for Immediate Discovery by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Ryan, Christopher)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT , Verified, filed by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. against John/Jane 1-10 Doe with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7950917 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Unknown. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Ryan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane 1-10 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp.
Represented By: Christopher J. Ryan
Represented By: John S. Artz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?