Mooradian Davis, PC v. Le Mobile, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mooradian Davis, PC
Defendant: Guy Charbonneau and Le Mobile, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv12138
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Mooradian Davis, PC Electing to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Kavanaugh, Kevin)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11) by Guy Charbonneau, Le Mobile, Inc.. (Bolton, Ian)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Guy Charbonneau, Le Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Consulting Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - 12-30-17 Emails, #4 Exhibit C - Williams v MBNA Am. Bank, N.A. Case) (Bolton, Ian)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Mooradian Davis, PC (Kavanaugh, Kevin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Mooradian Davis, PC against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Consulting Agreement, #3 Exhibit Email dated 11/29/2017, #4 Exhibit Email dated 12/17/2017, #5 Exhibit Email dated 1/1/2018, #6 Exhibit Email dated 1/15/2018, #7 Exhibit Email dated 1/24/2018, #8 Exhibit Affidavit of James Mooradian) (Kavanaugh, Kevin)
August 11, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Kavanaugh on behalf of Mooradian Davis, PC. (Kavanaugh, Kevin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Le Mobile, Inc. (Bolton, Ian)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Guy Charbonneau, Le Mobile, Inc. from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2020-182494-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7978763 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Bolton, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mooradian Davis, PC v. Le Mobile, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mooradian Davis, PC
Represented By: Kevin T. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Charbonneau
Represented By: Ian S. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: Ian S. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?