Razen v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Razen
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv12188
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
2 Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *09/15/20*. Designated lead case number is *20-11578*. (DPer)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER consolidating cases. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (DPer)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge George Caram Steeh in Detroit to District Judge Matthew F. Leitman in Flint. (NAhm)
August 14, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Middle District of Florida. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 Docket Sheet from Florida Middle; Case Number 6:19-cv-00831.
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to the Eastern District of Michigan. Thereafter, the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and close the case. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/13/2020. (JBS) [Transferred from flmd on 8/14/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Joint Stipulation/MOTION and Proposed Order to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Michigan by Brian Razen. (Bagge, Stephen) Modified on 8/13/2020 (ARJ). [Transferred from flmd on 8/14/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Corrected AMENDED COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC with Jury Demand filed by Brian Razen. Related document: Correcting #8 Amended Complaint filed by Brian Razen. (Attachments:#1Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bagge, Stephen) Modified on 5/6/2019 (AC). [Transferred from flmd on 8/14/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC with Jury Demand filed by Brian Razen. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Brian Razen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bagge, Stephen) [Transferred from flmd on 8/14/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT against FCA US LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15416745) filed by Brian Razen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bagge, Stephen) [Transferred from Docket Sheet from Florida Middle; Case Number 6:19-cv-00831.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Razen v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Razen
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Jeffrey Laurence Osterwise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Kathy A. Wisniewski
Represented By: Stephen A. D'Aunoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?