C-Spine Orthopedics, PLLC v. Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: C-Spine Orthopedics, PLLC
Defendant: Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv12240
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 10/13/2020 is Cancelled re #5 Order to Attend Scheduling Conference. The Court will issue a scheduling order pursuant to the Joint Discovery Plan. (HMon)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Favaro, Elizabeth)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company. (Favaro, Elizabeth)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nina M. Jankowski appearing on behalf of Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company (Jankowski, Nina)
August 19, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company (Favaro, Elizabeth)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-007441-NF. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7996113 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - LARA Information, #3 Exhibit B - Pleadings filed in the Wayne County Circuit Court case) (Favaro, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C-Spine Orthopedics, PLLC v. Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-Spine Orthopedics, PLLC
Represented By: Sharif Aref
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Favaro
Represented By: Nina M. Jankowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?