Al-Qawie v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Haifa Al-Qawie
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, INC., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. and Coopersurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv12248
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Second Amended Complaint due by 11/6/2020, Response due by 12/4/2020. See image for additional dates. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (MacKay, K)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Coopersurgical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Cooper Companies, Inc. for Coopersurgical, Inc.. (Peck, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Peck, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Peck, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, INC.. (Peck, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Teva Women's Health, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Women's Health, LLC. (Peck, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Teva Women's Health, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Peck, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, INC.. (Peck, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Teva Women's Health, LLC. (Peck, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Peck, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand and Notice of Intent to File Amended Complaint filed by Haifa Al-Qawie against Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, INC., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc.. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Smith, Timothy)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Coopersurgical, Inc. served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Smith, Timothy)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. The Cooper Companies, Inc. served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Smith, Timothy)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Teva Women's Health, LLC served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Smith, Timothy)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Teva Women's Health, Inc. served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Smith, Timothy)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, INC. served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Smith, Timothy)
August 19, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Haifa Al-Qawie against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7997107 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Smith, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Qawie v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haifa Al-Qawie
Represented By: Timothy P. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?