Fears
Appellant: Tamyka C. Fears
Appellee: Mark H. Shapiro
Case Number: 4:2020cv13230
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order to Show Cause on Tamyka C. Fears, 20314 Murray Hill, Detroit, MI 48235 (THal)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Tamyka C. Fears to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 1/20/2021. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 Designated Bankruptcy Record (VLun)
January 7, 2021 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of Receipt of Complete Record on Appeal (VLun)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Tamyka C. Fears, Bankruptcy Court case number 19-54711. Bankruptcy appeal filing fee not paid. (VLun)
December 9, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Documents on Tamyka C. Fears 20314 Murray Hill, Detroit, MI 48235 (VLun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tamyka C. Fears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mark H. Shapiro
Represented By: Tracy M. Clark
Represented By: Mark H. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?