Detroit Entertainment, LLC v. American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Detroit Entertainment, LLC
Defendant: American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv10661
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Detroit Entertainment, LLC re #16 Order Intent to File First Amended Complaint (Huget, J.)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph David Jean on behalf of Detroit Entertainment, LLC. (Jean, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Greenspan on behalf of Detroit Entertainment, LLC. (Greenspan, Scott)
April 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Physical Loss or Damage Appendix, #3 Exhibit 2 - Virus Exclusion Appendix, #4 Exhibit 3 - Three One Three Order, #5 Exhibit 4 - Kirsch Order, #6 Exhibit 5 - Firebirds v. Zurich Order) (Newa, Kenneth)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Defendant American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company's Response to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal. Response due by 4/26/2021 Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 29, 2021 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Detroit Entertainment, LLC (Wenner, Adam)
March 26, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea L. Hansen on behalf of Detroit Entertainment, LLC. (Hansen, Andrea)
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Michael Wenner on behalf of Detroit Entertainment, LLC. (Wenner, Adam)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Huget on behalf of Detroit Entertainment, LLC. (Huget, J.)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company (Newa, Kenneth)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Josephine A. DeLorenzo appearing on behalf of American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company (DeLorenzo, Josephine)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tanya Marie Murray appearing on behalf of American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company (Murray, Tanya)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles W. Browning appearing on behalf of American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company (Browning, Charles)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company for American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. (Newa, Kenneth)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kenneth C. Newa appearing on behalf of American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company (Newa, Kenneth)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 21-002630-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8401738 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Newa, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Detroit Entertainment, LLC v. American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detroit Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Represented By: Andrea L. Hansen
Represented By: Joseph David Jean
Represented By: Scott Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Josephine A. DeLorenzo
Represented By: Charles W. Browning
Represented By: Tanya Marie Murray
Represented By: Kenneth C. Newa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?