Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 24.127.136.79
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 24.127.136.79
Case Number: 4:2021cv11028
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying Defendant's #7 Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Quash or Vacate a Subpoena, by JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 24.127.136.79. (RLou)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Temporarily Sealing #7 MOTION to Quash filed by JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 24.127.136.79 Until Further Order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROTECTIVE ORDER Concerning Pseudonym for Defendant. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Paige Declaration, #2 Exhibit Stalzer Declaration, #3 Exhibit Williamson Declaration) (Bernier, Joel)
May 6, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 24.127.136.79 with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8453733 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 24.127.136.79
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 24.127.136.79
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joel A. Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?