Przykucki v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Robert Przykucki
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2021cv11082
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Mitchell on behalf of All Defendants. (Mitchell, John)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Incorporated. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Taylor Tapley Daly appearing on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Daly, Taylor)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sanjay Ghosh appearing on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03736. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2021: #2 MDL 2641 Docket Sheet, #3 MDL 2641 Transfer Order) (SSch).
May 11, 2021 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (SSch)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 *Amended by Doc. 7 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from azd Case Number 2:19-cv-03736 on 5/11/2021.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFERRED COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16971598 filed by Robert Przykucki. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd Case Number 2:19-cv-03736 on 5/11/2021.] .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Przykucki v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Przykucki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?