ALBERS et al v. SIMPSON et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS R. ALBERS, DALE E. BOGART, JR., TONY D. CARDWELL, JEFFERY L. FRY, STACI R. MOODY-GILBERT, JASON E. GRAHAM, ALLIED FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT, ALLIANCE SYSTEM FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT, NORTHEASTERN SYSTEM FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT, UNIFIED SYSTEM DIVISION, BMWED-IBT, ATCHISON, TOPEKA & SANTA FE FRISCO SYSTEM FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT, BURLINGTON SYSTEM DIVISION, BMWED-IBT, Patrick A. Charters, Chicago & Eastern Illinois System Division, BMWED-IBT, Michael A. Barrett, Commuter Railroad System Division, BMWED-IBT, Rolando Del Muro, Joliet and Eastern System Division, BMWED-IBT, Samuel J. Alexander, Southern System Division, BMWED-IBT, Joe Letizia, Wisconsin Central System Division, BMWED-IBT, Matthew Neis and Bessemer & Lake Eire System Division, BMWED-IBT
Defendant: FREDDIE N. SIMPSON, DAVID D. JOYNT, BRUCE G. GLOVER, ROGER D. SANCHEZ, LOUIS R. BELOW, JED DODD, JACK E. DAVID, DAVID L. CARROLL and BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION-IBT
Case Number: 4:2021cv11834
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing RESET for 10/7/2021 at 9:00 AM (**TIME CHANGE ONLY**) before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #33 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by LOUIS R. BELOW, FREDDIE N. SIMPSON, DAVID L. CARROLL, DAVID D. JOYNT, ROGER D. SANCHEZ, BRUCE G. GLOVER, JED DODD, JACK E. DAVID, BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION-IBT. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 22, 2021 Filing 34 REPLY to Response re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David D. Joynt) (Smith, Lisa)
September 22, 2021 Filing 33 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Smith, Lisa)
September 22, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY to Response re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION-IBT. (Osborne, William)
September 15, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gleason, Edward)
September 10, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY to #28 Response to Motion by All Plaintiffs. (Gleason, Edward)
September 10, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to Response re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gleason, Edward)
September 3, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #23 MOTION for Leave to File Updated Brief in Support of Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Smith, Lisa)
September 3, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION-IBT. (Osborne, William)
September 3, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs. Ex. A) (Smith, Lisa)
August 31, 2021 Filing 25 ERRATA Sheet re: #18 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,, filed by STACI R. MOODY-GILBERT, UNIFIED SYSTEM DIVISION, BMWED-IBT, ATCHISON, TOPEKA & SANTA FE FRISCO SYSTEM FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT, DALE E. BOGART, JR., JEFFERY L. FRY, DENNIS R. ALBERS, ALLIED FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT, BURLINGTON SYSTEM DIVISION, BMWED-IBT, JASON E. GRAHAM, ALLIANCE SYSTEM FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT, NORTHEASTERN SYSTEM FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT, TONY D. CARDWELL. by All Plaintiffs (Gleason, Edward)
August 30, 2021 Filing 24 ADDENDUM re #18 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,, by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Verification of Samuel J. Alexander, #2 Document Continuation Verification of Michael A. Barrett, #3 Document Continuation Verification of Rolando Del Muro, #4 Document Continuation Verification of Jason E. Graham) (Suetholz, David)
August 27, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Updated Brief in Support of Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Gleason, Edward)
August 27, 2021 Filing 22 EXHIBIT 19 - 10-31-2011 Simpson Letter to Granier re #18 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,, by All Plaintiffs (Gleason, Edward)
August 27, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #20 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2021 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1600297281?pwd=TFBERkVZVnpoWnAwVFRobElFM1Erdz09 Passcode: 155726 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1600297281# or +16468287666,,1600297281#| (HMon)
August 27, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Smith, Lisa)
August 25, 2021 Filing 19 INDEX of Exhibits re #18 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28 - 2021-06-24 Simpson Email to Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit 29 - 2021-06-25 Simpson Email to Plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit 30 - 2021-07-02 Amtrak Convention Call, #4 Exhibit 31 - 2021-07-02 BNSF Convention Call, #5 Exhibit 32 - 2021-07-02 Canadian Northern, #6 Exhibit 33 - 2021-07-02 CP Convention Call, #7 Exhibit 34 - 2021-07-02 CSX Convention Call, #8 Exhibit 35 - 2021-07-02 NS Convention Call, #9 Exhibit 36 - 2021-07-02 UP Convention Call, #10 Exhibit 37- GC CompProposal to FSimpson, #11 Exhibit 38 - DRAFT BYLAWS NS DRAFT, #12 Exhibit 39- Save the Date-Invite NESF 15th Quadrennial Convention - April 19, #13 Exhibit 40- VP SANCHEZ ACCEPTANCE NESF INVITE - MAY 21, #14 Exhibit 41 - BMWED-IBT Q&As, #15 Exhibit 42 - 1994 ConvAmendProp 58, #16 Exhibit 43 - 1995-07-19 Petty Letter to Fleming, #17 Exhibit 44 - 1995-1997 Packet re METRA Dispute, #18 Exhibit 45 - September 23, 1997 letter from Fleming to Petty, #19 Exhibit 46 - Petty's December 4, 1997 Letter and 1995, 1997 correspondence, #20 Exhibit 47 - 1998-01-07 - Granier Letter to Fleming, #21 Exhibit 48 - 1998-03-05 - NationalOffice Letter to Petty re No Jurisd re Appeal, #22 Exhibit 49 - 1998-01-09 - Scott letter -Mac Fleming Letter re Art XXIII, #23 Exhibit 50 - 1998-01-07 - Granier Letter to Fleming, #24 Exhibit 51 - 1998 Conv AmendProp 24, #25 Exhibit 52 - 1998 Conv AmendProp 15, #26 Exhibit 53 - 1998 Conv AmendProp 74 and related, #27 Exhibit 54 - 2014 Convention Res No 66, #28 Exhibit 55 - BMWED Journal - June July August, #29 Exhibit 56 - 2021-08-06 Kilgallon-Long Appeal Decision, #30 Exhibit 57 - August 15, 16, 2021 Dodd Emails) (Gleason, Edward)
August 25, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Patrick A. Charters, Chicago & Eastern Illinois System Division, BMWED-IBT, Michael A. Barrett, Commuter Railroad System Division, BMWED-IBT, Rolando Del Muro, Joliet and Eastern System Division, BMWED-IBT, Samuel J. Alexander, Southern System Division, BMWED-IBT, Joe Letizia, Wisconsin Central System Division, BMWED-IBT, Matthew Neis, Bessemer & Lake Eire System Division, BMWED-IBT. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2018 BMWE BYLAWS, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2004 BMWE-IBT Merger Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 - Allied Federation Bylaws, #5 Exhibit 4 - NESF BYLAWS Amended 09.26.17, #6 Exhibit 5 - USD 2018 Bylaws Amended to include ICGF Merger, #7 Exhibit 6 - 2021-07-15 Simpson Letter to Fry, #8 Exhibit 7 - ATSFF Bylaws, #9 Exhibit 8 - Burlington System Division Bylaws, #10 Exhibit 9 - Alliance-System-Federation-Bylaws, #11 Exhibit 10 - 2021-08-25 17-01 CE&I Bylaws, #12 Exhibit 11 - CRSD 2018 Bylaws, #13 Exhibit 12 - EJE Bylaws Elect. 2018-19, #14 Exhibit 13 - 21-08-12 2019 Revised SSD By Laws, #15 Exhibit 14 - WCSD 2018 Bylaws-Track Changes 10-29-18, #16 Exhibit 15 - B&LE bylaws, #17 Exhibit 16 - Hertel and Carroll- History of BMWE Excerpt, #18 Exhibit 17 - 2005 Simpson Speech to NESF Conv, #19 Exhibit 19 - 10-31-2011 Simpson Letter to Granier, #20 Exhibit 20 -2019 AffiliatedFed-CRSF Merger Mtg Minutes and Agreement, #21 Exhibit 21 - Jed Dodd Email Thread, #22 Exhibit 22 - 2021-06-10 Kennedy Email with Attachments, #23 Exhibit 23 - June 14 2021 E-Bd to Simpson, #24 Exhibit 24 - 2021-06-21 DoddAppointment Ltr, #25 Exhibit 25 - 2021-06-22 Simpson Letter to Membership, #26 Exhibit 26 - 2021-06-22 NDO Letter in Support, #27 Exhibit 27 - 2021-06-24 Simpson Response to E-Bd) (Gleason, Edward)[AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFFS AGAINST FREDDIE N.SIMPSON, DAVID D. JOYNT, BRUCE G. GLOVER, ROGER D. SANCHEZ, LOUIS R. BELOW, JED DODD, JACK E. DAVID, DAVID L. CARROLL, AND BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION-IBT] Modified on 8/26/2021 (DPer).
August 25, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2021 and 10/8/2021 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #13 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by STACI R. MOODY-GILBERT, UNIFIED SYSTEM DIVISION, BMWED-IBT, ATCHISON, TOPEKA & SANTA FE FRISCO SYSTEM FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT, DALE E. BOGART, JR., JEFFERY L. FRY, DENNIS R. ALBERS, ALLIED FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT, BURLINGTON SYSTEM DIVISION, BMWED-IBT, JASON E. GRAHAM, ALLIANCE SYSTEM FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT, NORTHEASTERN SYSTEM FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT, TONY D. CARDWELL. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 16, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Gleason, Edward)
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Keller on behalf of All Defendants. (Keller, Phillip)
August 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Keller on behalf of LOUIS R. BELOW, DAVID L. CARROLL, JACK E. DAVID, JED DODD, BRUCE G. GLOVER, DAVID D. JOYNT, ROGER D. SANCHEZ, FREDDIE N. SIMPSON. (Keller, Phillip)
August 16, 2021 Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Tsao, Clement)
August 16, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Osborne, Jr on behalf of BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION-IBT. (Osborne, William)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on Status Conference and Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 13, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Video Status Conference held on 8/13/2021. Order to follow setting briefing schedule. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Clement L Tsao on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Tsao, Clement)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David O Suetholz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Suetholz, David)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/13/2021 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Smith on behalf of All Defendants. (Smith, Lisa)
August 9, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Video Status Conference held on 8/9/2021. Court to hold additional status conference once Plaintiffs file preliminary injunction/temporary restraining order motion and Defendants counsel appears. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference RESET for 8/9/2021 at 4:30 PM (**TIME CHANGE ONLY**) before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 EXHIBIT 13 - 2021-06-10 Kennedy Email with Attachments re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by All Plaintiffs (Gleason, Edward)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 4:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/9/2021) (DPer).
August 9, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE VERIFIED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 501(b) by All Plaintiffs. (Gleason, Edward)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8568974 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2018 BMWE BYLAWS, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2004 BMWE-IBT Merger Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 - Jed Dodd Email Thread, #5 Exhibit 4 - 2005 Simpson Speech to NESF Conv, #6 Exhibit 5 - Allied Federation Bylaws, #7 Exhibit 6 - NESF BYLAWS Amended 09.26.17, #8 Exhibit 7 - USD 2018 Bylaws Amended to include ICGF Merger, #9 Exhibit 8 - 2021-07-15 Simpson Letter to Fry, #10 Exhibit 9 - ATSFF Bylaws, #11 Exhibit 10 - Burlington System Division Bylaws, #12 Exhibit 11 - Alliance-System-Federation-Bylaws, #13 Exhibit 12 - 2019 Affiliated Fed-CRSF Merger Mtg Minutes and Agreement, #14 Exhibit 14 - June 14 2021 E-Bd to Simpson, #15 Exhibit 15 - 2021-06-21 Dodd Appointment Ltr, #16 Exhibit 16 - 2021-06-22 Simpson Letter to Membership, #17 Exhibit 17 - 2021-06-21 NDO Letter in Support, #18 Exhibit 18 - 2014 Convention Res No 66, #19 Exhibit 19 - BMWED Journal - June July Aug, #20 Exhibit 20 - 2021-08-06 Kilgallon-Long Appeal Decision, #21 Exhibit 21 - 2021-06-24 Simpson Response to E-Bd, #22 Exhibit 22 - 2021-06-24 Simpson Email to Plaintiffs, #23 Exhibit 23 - 2021-06-25 Simpson Email to Plaintiffs, #24 Exhibit 24 - 2021-07-02 Amtrak Convention Call, #25 Exhibit 25 - 2021-07-02 BNSF Convention Call, #26 Exhibit 26 - 2021-07-02 Canadian Northern, #27 Exhibit 27 - 2021-07-02 CP Convention Call, #28 Exhibit 28 - 2021-07-02 CSX Convention Call, #29 Exhibit 29 - 2021-07-02 NS Convention Call, #30 Exhibit 30 - 2021-07-02 UP Convention Call, #31 Exhibit 31 - GC Comp Proposal to F Simpson, #32 Exhibit 32 - DRAFT BYLAWS NS DRAFT, #33 Exhibit 33 - Save the Date-Invite NESF 15th Quadrennial Convention 4- 19, #34 Exhibit 34 - VP SANCHEZ ACCEPTANCE NESF INVITE - MAY 21, #35 Exhibit 35 - BMWED-IBT Q&As, #36 Exhibit 36 - 1998 Conv Amend Prop 24, #37 Exhibit 37 - 1998 Conv Amend Prop 15, #38 Exhibit 38 - 1998 Conv Amend Prop 74 and related, #39 Exhibit 39 - 1994 Conv Amend Prop 58) (Gleason, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALBERS et al v. SIMPSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS R. ALBERS
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Represented By: Clement L Tsao
Represented By: David O Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE E. BOGART, JR.
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Represented By: Clement L Tsao
Represented By: David O Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY D. CARDWELL
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Represented By: Clement L Tsao
Represented By: David O Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERY L. FRY
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Represented By: Clement L Tsao
Represented By: David O Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACI R. MOODY-GILBERT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Represented By: Clement L Tsao
Represented By: David O Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON E. GRAHAM
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Represented By: Clement L Tsao
Represented By: David O Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIED FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Represented By: Clement L Tsao
Represented By: David O Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIANCE SYSTEM FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Represented By: Clement L Tsao
Represented By: David O Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHEASTERN SYSTEM FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Represented By: Clement L Tsao
Represented By: David O Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIFIED SYSTEM DIVISION, BMWED-IBT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Represented By: Clement L Tsao
Represented By: David O Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATCHISON, TOPEKA & SANTA FE FRISCO SYSTEM FEDERATION, BMWED-IBT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Represented By: Clement L Tsao
Represented By: David O Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BURLINGTON SYSTEM DIVISION, BMWED-IBT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Represented By: Clement L Tsao
Represented By: David O Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick A. Charters
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago & Eastern Illinois System Division, BMWED-IBT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Barrett
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commuter Railroad System Division, BMWED-IBT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Del Muro
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joliet and Eastern System Division, BMWED-IBT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel J. Alexander
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern System Division, BMWED-IBT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Letizia
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Central System Division, BMWED-IBT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Neis
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessemer & Lake Eire System Division, BMWED-IBT
Represented By: Edward Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREDDIE N. SIMPSON
Represented By: Lisa M. Smith
Represented By: Phillip M. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID D. JOYNT
Represented By: Lisa M. Smith
Represented By: Phillip M. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE G. GLOVER
Represented By: Lisa M. Smith
Represented By: Phillip M. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER D. SANCHEZ
Represented By: Lisa M. Smith
Represented By: Phillip M. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS R. BELOW
Represented By: Lisa M. Smith
Represented By: Phillip M. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JED DODD
Represented By: Lisa M. Smith
Represented By: Phillip M. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK E. DAVID
Represented By: Lisa M. Smith
Represented By: Phillip M. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID L. CARROLL
Represented By: Lisa M. Smith
Represented By: Phillip M. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION-IBT
Represented By: Lisa M. Smith
Represented By: Phillip M. Keller
Represented By: William W. Osborne,, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?