Caldwell Company v. Yousif
Plaintiff: The Caldwell Company
Defendant: Milad Yousif
Case Number: 4:2023cv10976
Filed: April 26, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: F Kay Behm
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1730 Collection Under Contract Guaranty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Summons by Milad Yousif. (SKra)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISCOVERY MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (THal)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Milad Yousif. (JOwe)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Milad Yousif, 2410 Bella Magnolia Court, Oakland Township, MI 48306 (THal)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order on Milad Yousif at 2410 BELLA MAGNOLIA COURT, OAKLAND TOWNSHIP, MI 48306. (EBut)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by The Caldwell Company (Cassell, Rebecca)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Milad Yousif* (TTho)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The Caldwell Company against Milad Yousif. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9326504 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Master Lease, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Guaranty, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Vehicle Lease Orders, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Prime Logistics' Bankruptcy Plan, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Order Confirming Prime Logistics' Bankruptcy Plan, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Notice of Default) (Cassell, Rebecca)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell Company v. Yousif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Caldwell Company
Represented By: Rebecca J. Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milad Yousif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?