Poole v. Pontiac, City of et al
Plaintiff: Gilbert Poole
Defendant: City of Pontiac, Officer Santiago Serna, Officer Oliver Mathes, County of Oakland, Richard Thompson, Charles Spiekerman, Rhonda C. Kline, Melinda Jackson, Allan J Warnick, DDS, Pontiac, City of, Santiago Serna, Oliver Mathes, Oakland, County of and Rhonda C. Rohtbart
Case Number: 4:2023cv11221
Filed: May 23, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Shalina D Kumar
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Filing 23 STIPULATION Substituting Defendant Officer Oliver Mathes, III by Gilbert Poole (Riddle, Kevin)
July 10, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) and Brief in Support by Melinda Jackson. (Waddell, Mary)
July 10, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Allan J Warnick, DDS served on 6/8/2023, answer due 6/29/2023. (Riddle, Kevin)
June 30, 2023 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance upon Jury Demand by Pontiac, City of, Santiago Serna. (Seward, T.)
June 29, 2023 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Clark, Robert)
June 29, 2023 Filing 18 [STRICKEN] WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Rhonda C. Kline waiver sent on 6/29/2023, answer due 9/27/2023. (Clark, Robert) Modified on 6/29/2023 (LGra).
June 29, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Layla Rose Sizemore on behalf of Rhonda C. Kline, Oakland, County of, Richard Thompson. (Sizemore, Layla)
June 29, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor S. Potter on behalf of Rhonda C. Kline, Oakland, County of, Richard Thompson. (Potter, Trevor)
June 29, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Clark on behalf of Rhonda C. Kline, Oakland, County of, Richard Thompson. (Clark, Robert)
June 29, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Potter on behalf of Rhonda C. Kline, Oakland, County of, Richard Thompson. (Potter, Steven)
June 29, 2023 NOTICE of Error directed to: Robert C. Clark re #18 Waiver of Service Executed (90 Day). Document is not flattened and contains fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT MELINDA JACKSON TO FILE A RESPONSE re #1 Complaint,, filed by Gilbert Poole. Response due by 7/10/2023 Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (NAhm)
June 20, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED #11 Attorney Appearance by Melinda Jackson with Certificate of Service (McCormick, Shelley)
June 20, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Shelley Moore McCormick appearing on behalf of Melinda Jackson with Certificate of Service (McCormick, Shelley)
June 20, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mary A. Waddell appearing on behalf of Melinda Jackson with Certificate of Service (Waddell, Mary)
June 16, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kali M. L. Henderson on behalf of Pontiac, City of, Santiago Serna. (Henderson, Kali)
June 16, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Joseph Seward on behalf of Pontiac, City of, Santiago Serna. (Seward, T.)
June 14, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Richard Thompson served on 6/1/2023, answer due 6/22/2023. (Riddle, Kevin) Modified on 6/14/2023 (SSch). [Date of Service is 6/12/2023]
June 8, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Santiago Serna served on 6/1/2023, answer due 6/22/2023. (Riddle, Kevin)
June 8, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Melinda Jackson served on 6/1/2023, answer due 6/22/2023. (Riddle, Kevin)
June 8, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Oakland, County of served on 6/1/2023, answer due 6/22/2023. (Riddle, Kevin)
June 5, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Pontiac, City of served on 5/31/2023, answer due 6/21/2023. (Riddle, Kevin)
May 23, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DAll)
May 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9359223 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Ingham - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Riddle, Kevin)
May 23, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poole v. Pontiac, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Poole
Represented By: Kevin C. Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pontiac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Santiago Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Oliver Mathes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Thompson
Represented By: Layla Rose Sizemore
Represented By: Robert C. Clark
Represented By: Trevor S. Potter
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Spiekerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda C. Kline
Represented By: Layla Rose Sizemore
Represented By: Robert C. Clark
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Represented By: Trevor S. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Jackson
Represented By: Mary A. Waddell
Represented By: Shelley Moore McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan J Warnick, DDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pontiac, City of
Represented By: Kali M. L. Henderson
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santiago Serna
Represented By: Kali M. L. Henderson
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Mathes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland, County of
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Represented By: Trevor S. Potter
Represented By: Layla Rose Sizemore
Represented By: Robert C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda C. Rohtbart
Represented By: Layla Rose Sizemore
Represented By: Robert C. Clark
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Represented By: Trevor S. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?