Christian v. Flint, City of et al
Plaintiff: Kino Christian
Defendant: Lee Ann Gaspar and Flint, City of
Case Number: 4:2024cv12041
Filed: August 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Shalina D Kumar
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Lee Ann Gaspar. (Wolf, Barry)
September 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension to File an Answer or Responsive Pleading. Defendant Lee Ann Gaspar's Answer due by 9/23/2024. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
August 27, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Answer to Complaint by Flint, City of (Gildner, Michael)
August 27, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand (Reliance on Jury Demand) by Flint, City of. (Gildner, Michael)
August 21, 2024 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Barry A. Wolf appearing on behalf of Lee Ann Gaspar (Wolf, Barry)
August 13, 2024 NOTICE of Error directed to: Michael J. Gildner re #6 Attorney Appearance. Other: Document is a Certificate of Service. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (JPar)
August 12, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Attorney Appearance by Flint, City of (Gildner, Michael)
August 12, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. Gildner appearing on behalf of Flint, City of (Gildner, Michael)
August 12, 2024 Filing 6 [STRICKEN - DOCUMENT IS A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE] ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. Gildner appearing on behalf of Flint, City of (Gildner, Michael) Modified on 8/13/2024 (JPar).
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Detroit to District Judge Shalina D. Kumar and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford in Flint. (SSch)
August 6, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Trevor B. Garrison appearing on behalf of Kino Christian (Garrison, Trevor)
August 5, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Lee Ann Gaspar* (CShr)
August 5, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Flint, City of* (CShr)
August 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9888617 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Genesee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC EDMICH, 24-cv-11603, Judge Hon. Shalina D. Kumar] (Dezsi, Michael)
August 5, 2024 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (CShr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian v. Flint, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kino Christian
Represented By: Michael R. Dezsi
Represented By: Trevor B. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Ann Gaspar
Represented By: Barry A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint, City of
Represented By: Michael J. Gildner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?