Hill et al v. Granholm et al
Plaintiff: Henry Hill, Jemal Tipton, Damion Todd, Bobby Hines, Kevin Boyd, Bosie Smith, Jennifer Pruitt, Matthew Bentley and Keith Maxey
Defendant: Jennifer Granholm, Patricia Caruso and Barbara Sampson
Case Number: 5:2010cv14568
Filed: November 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Ann Arbor Office
County: Lapeer
Presiding Judge: John Corbett O'Meara
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 OPINION OVERRULING OBJECTIONS. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 OPINION & ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment with Respect to Count VI (Dkt. 292 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 OPINION & ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 267 ). (TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 04:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call, and then include the Court by calling (313) 234-5240 when all parties are on the line. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 OPINION & ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion for Clarification (Dkt. 215 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 OPINION & ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion for Stay (Dkt. 201 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 OPINION and ORDER Granting 147 MOTION to Dismiss, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 OPINION and ORDER Denying 136 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Granting 136 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; Set Motion Deadline/Hearing as to 136 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 7/18/2016, Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2016 10:30 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying 120 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying 110 Motion to Stay; granting 111 Motion for Immediate Consideration. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Requiring Immediate Compliance with Miller. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 75 Motion for Ruling on Scope of Summary Judgment Order; and denying as moot 84 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; and Denying Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 34 Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. Granholm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Hill
Represented By: Deborah A. LaBelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jemal Tipton
Represented By: Deborah A. LaBelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damion Todd
Represented By: Deborah A. LaBelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Hines
Represented By: Deborah A. LaBelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Boyd
Represented By: Deborah A. LaBelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bosie Smith
Represented By: Deborah A. LaBelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Pruitt
Represented By: Deborah A. LaBelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bentley
Represented By: Deborah A. LaBelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Maxey
Represented By: Deborah A. LaBelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Granholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?