Broughman v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Scott E. Broughman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2018cv13318
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT ORDER. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT of Social Security Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Admin record - 002, #2 Document Continuation Admin record - 003, #3 Document Continuation Admin record - 004, #4 Document Continuation Admin record - 005, #5 Document Continuation Admin record - 006, #6 Document Continuation Admin record - 007, #7 Document Continuation Admin record - 008, #8 Document Continuation Admin record - 009, #9 Document Continuation Admin record - 010, #10 Document Continuation Admin record - 011, #11 Document Continuation Admin record - 012, #12 Document Continuation Admin record - 013, #13 Document Continuation Admin record - 014, #14 Document Continuation Admin record - 015, #15 Document Continuation Admin record - 016) (Mays, Vanessa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Mays, Vanessa)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Scott E. Broughman (Robison, Charles)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Santen on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Santen, Sean)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General* (EKar)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (THac)
October 24, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SKra)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Scott E. Broughman. (Robison, Charles)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Scott E. Broughman against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Jackson - County Where Action Arose: Jackson - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Robison, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broughman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sean Santen
Represented By: Vanessa Miree Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott E. Broughman
Represented By: Charles A. Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?