Mastronardi-USA Distribution Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mastronardi-USA Distribution Services, Inc.
Defendant: John Cameron
Case Number: 5:2019cv11119
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
May 20, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on May 20, 2019 is Cancelled due to the parties reaching a settlement agreement in this case. The stipulation and order of dismissal is due by no later than July 1, 2019. (SBur)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 For Preliminary Injunction WITNESS LIST by Mastronardi-USA Distribution Services, Inc. (Dwyer, Maria)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 (For May 20, 2019 evidentiary hearing) WITNESS LIST by John Cameron (Farrar, Brian)
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. John Cameron served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Shekell, Brian)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying in Part Plaintiff's #2 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Expedite Discovery. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond J. Sterling on behalf of John Cameron. (Sterling, Raymond)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Farrar on behalf of John Cameron. (Farrar, Brian)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Correction re 9 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. (SKra)
April 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *John Cameron* (SKra)
April 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2019 re #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Discovery. (Motion Hearing re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 5/20/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy) Disposition: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Denied & #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Discovery Granted. (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (SBur)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Shekell on behalf of Mastronardi-USA Distribution Services, Inc.. (Shekell, Brian)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 ERRATA Sheet re: #1 Complaint,,, filed by Mastronardi-USA Distribution Services, Inc.. by Mastronardi-USA Distribution Services, Inc. for Exhibit F (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit F - color photo) (Dwyer, Maria)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Mastronardi-USA Distribution Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 10/10/17 letter, #3 Exhibit B - 5/3/1B - Separation Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - 9/4/18 Email, #5 Exhibit D - 10/1/18 email, #6 Exhibit E - 3/2019 photo) (Dwyer, Maria)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF HEARING on #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Mastronardi-USA Distribution Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 10/10/17 letter, #3 Exhibit 5/3/1B - Separation Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - 9/4/18 Email, #5 Exhibit D - 9/17/18 letter, #6 Exhibit E - 10/1/18 email, #7 Exhibit F - 3/2019 Photo, #8 Exhibit G - letter) (Dwyer, Maria)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mastronardi-USA Distribution Services, Inc. against John Cameron. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7202063 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit A - 10/10/17 Letter, #3 Exhibit B - 5/3/1B Separation Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - 9/4/18 Email, #5 Exhibit D - 9/17/18 letter, #6 Exhibit E - 10/1/18 Email, #7 Exhibit F - 3/2019 Photo, #8 Exhibit G - 3/28/19 Letter) (Dwyer, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mastronardi-USA Distribution Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cameron
Represented By: Raymond J. Sterling
Represented By: Brian Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mastronardi-USA Distribution Services, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Fracassa Dwyer
Represented By: Brian Shekell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?